+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-403).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-403) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- (Yeas 101 - Nays 35 - Absent 12 - Excused 1) - Vacant 2
- ROLL CALL NO. 350
- On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-403)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-403) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 406 Yeas 32 - Nays 0 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 596 - 24-A section 2159, sub-section 7
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2020: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 12
February 25, 2020: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor