+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-29), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-29) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-29).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 401, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 20-A section 401, sub-section 6
- Chapter 421 - 20-A section 401, sub-section 2
- Chapter 421 - 20-A section 401, sub-section 6
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor