+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (50)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- 75 having voted in the affirmative and 73 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 657V
- This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
- Sent down for concurrence
- LD 1747 In Senate, April 18, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 3 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve FAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
- FAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With ACCEPTANCE of Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-388) AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-388) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-690) thereto in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-388) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-690) thereto.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-388) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-690) thereto was ADOPTED.
- On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, House Amendment "A" (H-690) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-388) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-388) was READ.
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- Unfinished Business
- On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Any Report.
- Later today assigned.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-388)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-388) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 542 Yeas 33 - Nays 1 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Report A Ought to Pass as Amended By COMMITTEE AMENDMENT "A" (S-388) ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On December 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 73
- Absent: 3
April 18, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
March 20, 2018: ACCEPT RPT 'A' OTP-A
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1