+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-371).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-371)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-371) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On December 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 19, 2017 and REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 2901, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 20-A section 2951, sub-section 6
- Chapter null - 20-A section 2901, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 20-A section 2951, sub-section 7
- Chapter 342 - 20-A section 2901, sub-section 2
- Chapter 342 - 20-A section 2951, sub-section 6
- Chapter 342 - 20-A section 2901, sub-section 2, paragraph A
- Chapter 342 - 20-A section 2951, sub-section 7
+ − Sponsors (4)
LANGLEY
Type:
Primary Sponsor