+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-616), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-616) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-616).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On December 22, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- Chapter null - 12 section 6450
- Chapter null - 12 section 6450-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 6450, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 12 section 6450, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 12 section 6450, sub-section 2
- Chapter 352 - 12 section 6450
- Chapter 352 - 12 section 6450-A
- Chapter 352 - 12 section 6450, sub-section 1
- Chapter 352 - 12 section 6450, sub-section 3
- Chapter 352 - 12 section 6450, sub-section 2