+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-621) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-621) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-621) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-621).
On December 22, 2017 in the House:
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 19, 2017.