+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-262).
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-262) Report and the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-262)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-262) Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-262) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-262)
- Sent down for concurrence
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 285
- (Yeas 75 - Nays 67 - Absent 8 - Excused 1)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "B" (S-263) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-263).
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
- Senator DILL of Penobscot moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter null - 7 section 606, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 12 section 8869, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 8869, sub-section 1
- Chapter 84 - 7 section 606, sub-section 3
- Chapter 84 - 12 section 8869, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter 84 - 12 section 8869, sub-section 1
+ − Vote
June 17, 2019: ACC MIN OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor