+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 79 - Nays 65 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 79
- On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 155 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
On April 30, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 23, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 21, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter null - 36 section 5216-E
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 65
- Absent: 7
May 19, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor