+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
- LD 1677 In Senate, April 15, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 in Favor and 0 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 145 having voted in the affirmative and 0 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 642V
- This Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-632) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-632), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-632)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2016: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 145
- Absent: 6
April 15, 2016: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor