+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On December 20, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 18, 2017.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 32 section 11013, sub-section 9, paragraph D
- Chapter 318 - 32 section 11013, sub-section 9, paragraph D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor