+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Reports READ.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-511).
- ROLL CALL NO. 596
- (Yeas 128 - Nays 22 - Absent 1 - Excused 0)
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reports READ.
- On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-511) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-511)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Mason of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 12, 2016: PASS TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMEND
- Yeas: 128
- Nays: 22
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor