+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On July 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-364).
On July 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-364) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-364) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) in concurrence
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-299).
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-299).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-299) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On May 27, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 479 - 36 section 5219-S, sub-section 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Eloise VITELLI
Type:
Primary Sponsor