+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On July 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending , in concurrence.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-177) thereto, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) as amended by House Amendment " A" (H-177) thereto ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- House Amendment "A" (H-177) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) READ
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) was READ.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-177) thereto ADOPTED.
- On motion of Representative EVANGELOS of Friendship, House Amendment "A" (H-177) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-151) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-177) thereto.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence.
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
- Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 352 - 5 section 3372
- Chapter 352 - 5 section 12004-G, sub-section 30-E
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor