+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 725 Yeas 30 - Nays 0 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 117 - Nays 0 - Absent 30 - Excused 0 - Vacant 4)
- ROLL CALL NO. 530
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-488) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-488).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-488).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 31, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 8, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 28, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on May 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 606 - 22 section 8741
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsor
Ned CLAXTON
Type:
Primary Sponsor