+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-565), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-565) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-565)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative FOWLE for the Criminal Law Advisory Commission pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 17-A, section 1354, subsection 2, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (45)
- Chapter 431 - 1 section 71, sub-section 12
- Chapter 431 - 14 section 3142, sub-section 3
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1, sub-section 2
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 101-D, sub-section 2
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 224-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 454
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 652, sub-section 6
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 812, sub-section 1
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1003, sub-section 5-A
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1003, sub-section 11
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1004
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1028
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1028-A
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1029, sub-section 1
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1030, paragraph 2
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1094, paragraph 2
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1097, sub-section 3
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1097, sub-section 4
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 1121, sub-section 2
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 2115-A, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 2115-A, sub-section 2-B
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 2115-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 2115-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 2138, sub-section 1
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 2138, sub-section 10
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 2151, sub-section 2
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 3102
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 3202
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 3302
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 3305, paragraph 1
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 3309
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 3311-C, sub-section 4
- Chapter 431 - 15 section 5826, sub-section 2
- Chapter 431 - 16 section 53-C, sub-section 3, paragraph E
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 101, sub-section 1
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 960, sub-section 2
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 1172, sub-section 1, paragraph B-1
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 1173
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 1176, sub-section 4
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 1206, sub-section 4
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 1207
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 1253, sub-section 13
- Chapter 431 - 17-A section 1348-B, sub-section 4
- Chapter 431 - 22 section 3022, sub-section 13, paragraph B
- Chapter 431 - 25 section 1542-A, sub-section 1, paragraph D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor