+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-420) In NON-CONCURRENCE
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 567 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
- Taken from the table by the President
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-420) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-420)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Unfinished Business
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Reported by Senator ROSEN for the Criminal Justice and Public Safety pursuant to Joint Order 2015, S.P. 631.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 30, 2016: ACCEPT MIN OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor