+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-408).
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report In NON-CONCURRENCE
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- ROLL CALL NO. 511
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 66 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-408) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-408).
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 529 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Reported by Senator BRAKEY for the Health and Human Services pursuant to Joint Order 2015, S.P. 631.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2016: ACC MIN OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 66
- Absent: 8
March 22, 2016: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor