+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Possession of the Senate Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator SANBORN, L. of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-168).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-168).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-168) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter null - 36 section 1760, sub-section 23-C, paragraph F
- Chapter null - 36 section 1760, sub-section 23-C, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 36 section 1760, sub-section 23-C, paragraph C
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor