+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (58)
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- The Senate On motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-464)
- AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) thereto
- On motion by Same Senator RECEDED From ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) thereto
- On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) To Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) and indefinitly postponed the same.
- On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) and indefinitly postponed the same.
- On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-545) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-545) In NON-CONCURRENCE
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Representative RUSSELL of Portland REQUESTED a Roll Call on the motion to RECEDE and CONCUR. Less than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was NOT ORDERED.
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-545).
- ROLL CALL NO. 646
- (Yeas 115 - Nays 27 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) thereto ADOPTED
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- On motion of Representative ROTUNDO of Lewiston, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) thereto
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- (Yeas 82 - Nays 66 - Absent 3 - Excused 0)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) READ
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 586 Yeas 30 - Nays 4 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 559
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) as Amended by House Amendment "C" (H-643) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) thereto was ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative ROTUNDO of Lewiston, House Amendment "C" (H-643) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) was READ and ADOPTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) as Amended by House Amendment "C" (H-643) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) thereto.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) was READ.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) thereto.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, House Amendment "B" (H-642) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- On motion of Representative STUCKEY of Portland, House Amendment "B" (H-642) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) was READ.
- Senate Amendment "A" (S-467) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-464) was READ and ADOPTED.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2016: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 27
- Absent: 9
April 5, 2016: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 66
- Absent: 3
April 5, 2016: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor