+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-703), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-703) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator JOHNSON of Lincoln the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-703) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-703).
On December 30, 2013 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6072, sub-section 13, paragraph G
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6072, sub-section 18
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6072-A, sub-section 1
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6072-A, sub-section 8
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6072-A, sub-section 24
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6072-C, sub-section 2
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6072-C, sub-section 7-A
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6072-C, sub-section 10
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6601, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 509 - 12 section 6863, paragraph 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor