+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative HERBIG for the Joint Standing Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 955, subsection 4 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor