+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (53)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
- ROLL CALL NO. 776V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 94 having voted in the affirmative and 53 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-849) thereto.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 95 - Nays 52 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) was READ.
- On motion of Representative EVES of North Berwick, House Amendment "A" (H-849) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) was READ and ADOPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 736
- (Yeas 95 - Nays 52 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-849) thereto ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- ROLL CALL NO. 735
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 94 - Nays 51 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 745
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-849) thereto , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) As Amended By House Amendment "A" (H-849) ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- House Amendment "A" (H-849) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-704) READ
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 606 19 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent PREVAILED
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On December 30, 2013 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 23, 2013.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 1, 2014: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 53
- Absent: 4
April 17, 2014: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 4
April 17, 2014: ADOPT HAH-849 TO CAH-704
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 4
April 17, 2014: Enactment
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 6
April 17, 2014: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor