+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 538
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 54 - Nays 92 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-405) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-405)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT.
- Reports READ.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- (Yeas 69 - Nays 74 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 475
- Subsequently, the motion to REFER the Bill to the Committee on JUDICIARY FAILED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Bill was TABLED pending REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Speaker EVES of North Berwick moved that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY
- Taken from the table by the President
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on JUDICIARY
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2016: Acc Min Ought Not to Pass Rep
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 92
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2016: Reference to Judiciary
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 74
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor