+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 512 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
March 1, 2016: FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor