+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-222), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-222) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-222)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 186 - 30-A section 4353, sub-section 4
- Chapter 186 - 30-A section 4353-A
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor