+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- FAILED ENACTMENT
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot.
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 83 - Nays 61 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 375
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken.
- FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-306)..
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-306) READ and ADOPTED .
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- PREVAILED
- (21 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 308
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reports READ.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reports READ.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending the motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 357
- (Yeas 80 - Nays 55 - Absent 16 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-306) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-306).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 19, 2013: Enactment - Emer
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 61
- Absent: 7
June 18, 2013: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 16
June 18, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor