+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Possession of the Senate Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-37) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-37).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-37) Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
- Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his motion to Accept the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report.
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-37) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-37)
- Sent down for concurrence
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report,
- Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 22 section 3174-BBB
- Chapter null - 22 section 3174-AAA, sub-section 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor