+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (50)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-710) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-478) thereto and House Amendment "A" (H-721).
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Carried over to any special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 612
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- Later today assigned.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-710) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-478) thereto AND House Amendment "A" (H-721) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- House Amendment "A" (H-721) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-710) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-478) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-478) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-710) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-710) READ
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently Report Accepted in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report
- Report READ
- Unfinished Business
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-710) and House Amendment "A" (H-721).
- On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, House Amendment "A" (H-721) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-710) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Subsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- On OBJECTION of Representative HERBIG of Belfast REMOVED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Unfinished Business
- The Committee Report was READ.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report.
- Later today assigned.
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
- Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph FF
- Chapter null - 36 section 2535
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph NN
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph OO
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph PP
- Chapter null - 36 section 199-C, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12541, sub-section 8
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12541, sub-section 9
+ − Vote
April 18, 2018: TABLE UNTIL LATER
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 69
- Absent: 5