+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Possession of the House Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES. (DEAD)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Bill RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1319)
- On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- On further motion of same Representative The Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order HP 1112.
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Labor and Housing in concurrence
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 247 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-448) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-448) READ and ADOPTED
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
- Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-448).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-448) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
- Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter null - 26 section
- Chapter null - 26 section 691
- Chapter null - 26 section 594-A
+ − Vote
June 10, 2019: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor