+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- (Yeas 146 - Nays 0 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 203
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-258) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-258), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-258)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 5, 2013: FINAL PASSAGE - PUBLIC LAND
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 5