+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 113 - Nays 29 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 512
- On motion of Representative DILL of Old Town, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry, in concurrence.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 5, 2014: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor