+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-49).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-49) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-49), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 25, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 9, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Reconsidered
On February 19, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 19, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 53 - 38 section 1-A