+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Gratwick of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative HYMANSON for the Department of Health and Human Services pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 8072 and approved for introduction by a majority of the Legislative Council, reports that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor