+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate ADHERED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-533) In NON-CONCURRENCE
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-533) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-533) READ and ADOPTED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 544 Yeas 19 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- Unfinished Business
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Reports READ
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 78 - Nays 62 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 484
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On December 23, 2015 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2015.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 24, 2016: ACCEPT MIN OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2016: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 62
- Absent: 11