+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 124
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-216).
- (Yeas 115 - Nays 29 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-216) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 240 - 28-A section 4, sub-section 1
+ − Vote
May 22, 2013: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor