+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On July 9, 2018 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 114 having voted in the affirmative and 28 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 736V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- LD 1490 In Senate, July 9, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On July 9, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Engrossing Department.
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- (Yeas 82 - Nays 40 - Absent 29 - Excused 0)
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-268) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-535) thereto.
- ROLL CALL NO. 685
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-268)
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-268) was ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-535) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-268) READ and ADOPTED
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-268) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-535) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Sent down for concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-268) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-535) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-268).
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-268) READ and ADOPTED.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-268).
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
July 9, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 9
July 9, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2018: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 40
- Absent: 29
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor