+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (58)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "B" (H-529) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-514) thereto.
- On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of House Amendment "A" (H-514) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-186).
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, House Amendment "A" (H-514) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-529) thereto was ADOPTED.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "B" (H-529) in concurrence
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Subsequently, The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-529) thereto.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-514) thereto.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-514) in concurrence
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, Representative HYMANSON of York moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- On motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending the motion of Representative HYMANSON of York to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, House Amendment "A" (H-514) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) was READ.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-514) thereto was ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-186) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-514) thereto.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from the table by the President
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 279 Yeas 18 - Nays 14 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report,
- Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 12, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor