+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 201 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On June 2, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On May 6, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 8, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph M-2
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph C-1
+ − Vote
June 3, 2021: ACCEPT MIN OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1