+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers.
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (H-421) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (H-421) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Committee Amendment "B" (H-421) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 297 30 Yeas - 4 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Representative GATTINE of Westbrook moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 18, 2015: ACCEPT MIN OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1