+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Bill was in the possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-243) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-243) .
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-243).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS