+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 620 Yeas 3 - Nays 31 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
- Reports Read
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 53 - Nays 76 - Absent 19 - Excused 0 - Vacant 3)
- ROLL CALL NO. 465
- Motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
- Reports READ.
On March 1, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On February 3, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 27, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
- Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4354-A
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2022: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 31
March 9, 2022: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 76
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor