+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Bill was in the possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-399), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-399) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-399)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Woodsome of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
- Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.