+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- (Yeas 136 - Nays 6 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 212
- On motion of Representative DILL of Old Town, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED .
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-169) READ and ADOPTED .
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-169)..
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Senator JACKSON of Aroostook moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY
- Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 6, 2013: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 9