+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Senate ADHERED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-575) In NON-CONCURRENCE
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-575) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-575) Roll Call Number 540 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 540 Yeas 18 - Nays 13 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Reports READ
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- ROLL CALL NO. 504
- (Yeas 76 - Nays 67 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset, REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2016: ACCEPT MIN OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
March 22, 2016: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 67
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor