+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- (33 -Yeas, 2 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 271
- On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
- FAILED
- (17 -Yeas, 18 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 268
- Motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc to RECEDE and CONCUR to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and Passage to be Engrossed as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-417) FAILED. (Roll Call Ordered)
- PREVAILED
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- FAILED
- Reports READ.
- Senator PATRICK of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) Roll Call Number 250
- (15 -Yeas, 20 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Subsequently, on motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-417).
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Motion of Representative WILLETTE of Mapleton to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. ROLL CALL NO. 301
- (Yeas 59 - Nays 84 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- (Yeas 87 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 275
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-417) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-417).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec moved to REFER to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT, in concurrence.
- On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE.
- (Unfinished Business)
- Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec, requested and received leave of the Senate to WITHDRAW her Motion to Refer to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence.
- On further motion by same Senator, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 13, 2013: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 18
June 13, 2013: INSIST
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
June 12, 2013: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 84
- Absent: 8
June 12, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 20
June 11, 2013: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 8