+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- (Yeas 126 - Nays 14 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
- Reports READ.
- ROLL CALL NO. 174
- On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-176) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-176).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-176)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-176) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 24 section 2904, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4316
- Chapter 289 - 24 section 2904, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 289 - 24-A section 4316
+ − Vote
June 4, 2019: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 126
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Geoffrey GRATWICK
Type:
Primary Sponsor