+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 78 - Nays 57 - Absent 16 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 102
- On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On May 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On April 29, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on March 24, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 2, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 16