+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 79 - Nays 64 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 69
- On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
On May 18, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP
On April 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 23, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Vote
June 2, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Lisa KEIM
Type:
Primary Sponsor