+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- 15 Yeas - 19 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 23
- Subsequently, Motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland The Senate RECEDE From ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE. FAILED
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Roll Call Ordered
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland to RECEDE from ACCEPTANCE of Minority Ought Not To Pass Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Senator ALFOND of Cumberland moved The Senate RECEDE From ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Senator MASON of Androscoggin moved The Senate INSIST To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 14
- (Yeas 87 - Nays 59 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 20 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- Subsequently, On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
- Unfinished Business
- Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report .
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report .
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
+ − Votes (3)
April 9, 2015: RECEDE
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2015: ACC MAJ OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 5
March 31, 2015: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor