+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-321) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-321) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- Reports READ On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-321) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-321).
On June 2, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On May 6, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on March 22, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph M-2
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph C-1